Fremes, Stephen Edward (CPSO#: 50594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H Wing Room 405
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6073
Fax: (416) 480-4439
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fremes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fremes ( CPSO# 50594 )

Business Address:
H405 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6073

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD FREMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1986