Friars, Lisa Carolyn (CPSO#: 103421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medicine Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas G. Friars Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Friars ( CPSO# 103421)
Dr. D. Friars ( CPSO# 54566 )

Business Address:
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Suite 101
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA CAROLYN FRIARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIARS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017