Friedlich, Martin Sheldon (CPSO#: 64058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Room W1623 - CCW Building
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6650
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Friedlich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Friedlich ( CPSO# 64058 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN SHELDON FRIEDLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDLICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992