Friedman, Aaron Avrom (CPSO#: 59748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 418
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 929-1530
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14 Prince Arthur Avenue suite 205
Toronto ON  M5R 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 944-3526
Fax: (416) 944-3654
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON AVROM FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989