Froeschl, Sandra (CPSO#: 79689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: Fischer, Sandra (used until: 29 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hanover Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Froeschl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Froeschl ( CPSO# 73862 )
Dr. S. Froeschl ( CPSO# 79689 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite 1289
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4049

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA FROESCHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESCHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2008