Fung, Celeste Yuen-Yee (CPSO#: 84465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Patricks Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone: (613) 731-4660
Fax: (613) 731-4056
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perley and Rideau Veterans' Health
Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 526-7170
Fax: 613-526-7157
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rangwala Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangwala ( CPSO# 84468 )
Dr. C. Fung ( CPSO# 84465 )

Business Address:
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7788

Business Address:
St. Patrick Nursing Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Business Address:
Perley and Rideau Veteran's Health
Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 526-7170

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELESTE YUEN-YEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008