Fung, Michael G (CPSO#: 87854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-9166
Fax: (905) 237-9266
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fung ( CPSO# 87854 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-9166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL G FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008