Fung, Sarah Sze Lok (CPSO#: 88569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. L. Sarah Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014