Fuss, Jeffrey William (CPSO#: 57145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
JW Fuss Medicine Prof Corp
E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196676538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. W. Fuss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fuss ( CPSO# 57145 )

Business Address:
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987