Gagnier, Rachel Melissa (CPSO#: 94244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-554
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. M. Gagnier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gagnier ( CPSO# 94244 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL MELISSA GAGNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011