Gaind, Gagan Singh (CPSO#: 55336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Room T10 157
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34370
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagan Gaind Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gaind ( CPSO# 55336 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Unit T10-157
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAGAN SINGH GAIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAIND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987