Gale, Jeffrey Steven (CPSO#: 72490)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 04 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Gale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 04 Mar 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Dec 2013
Summary:

On December 13, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeffrey Steven Gale committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and in that he has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Gale denied the allegations.  
 
Dr. Gale is an ophthalmologist. He participated in the hiring of a young female patient, Ms X, to 
work as his family’s live in nanny. The medical issues for which Ms X was under the care of Dr. 
Gale were significant and ongoing.  
 
After hiring Ms X, Dr. Gale developed a personal and flirtatious relationship with her which was 
inappropriate for him to have had with a patient. It included taking hot tubs and watching 
television together. He also allowed for utterances of a sexual nature with this patient and 
engaged in a pattern of sexualized interaction which was inappropriate. 
 
During the doctor-patient relationship, Dr. Gale and Ms X had an intimate sexual relationship 
which involved oral sex and sexual intercourse. 
 
On March 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
   •  the Registrar revoke Dr. Gale’s certificate of registration effective immediately.  
   •  Dr. Gale appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   •  Dr. Gale reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
      required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
      security acceptable to the College within 30 days of this Order, in the amount of 
      $16,060.00.  
   •  Dr. Gale pay costs to the College in the amount of $44,600.00 within 30 days of this 
      Order. 

On April 4, 2014, Dr. Gale appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior 
Court of Justice (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline 
Committee remains in effect despite the appeal. 
 
On March 25, 2015, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Gale’s appeal. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Notice of Appeal
Appeal Decision Date: 04 Apr 2014
Hearing Date(s): January 28-February 1, February 4-8, 2013