Galea, Anthony Michael (CPSO#: 56971)

Current Status: Suspended as of 06 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Maltese

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Galea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Galea ( CPSO# 56971 )

Business Address:
I S M Health & Wellness Centre
230 Browns Line
Toronto ON  M8W 3T4
Phone Number: (416) 620-6861

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 06 Dec 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2017 Active

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 2016
Summary:

On October 24, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Anthony Michael Galea committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise and he engaged 
in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or 
unprofessional. 
 
On July 6, 2011, Dr. Galea, a sports medicine physician, pleaded guilty and was convicted by the 
U.S District Court for the Western District of New York for introducing misbranded drugs into 
interstate commerce with intent to mislead an Agency. 
 
Between February 2007 and September 2009, Dr. Galea lived and was a physician licensed to 
practice medicine in Ontario. He was not licensed to practice medicine in the United States. Dr. 
Galea operated a medical practice in Etobicoke known as the Institute of Sports Medicine Health 
and Wellness Centre (ISM). 
 
Dr. Galea traveled from Canada to the United States on numerous occasions to treat patients 
there, knowing he was not licenced to practice anywhere in the United States. Sometimes Dr. 
Galea was accompanied by an ISM employee to assist him; sometimes he and the employee 
traveled separately and Dr. Galea met the employee in the United States; and on other occasions 
Dr. Galea traveled to the United States alone and treated patients in the United States without the 
employee being present. 
 
Dr. Galea treated professional athletes in the U.S., including players on National Football League 
and Major League Baseball teams. 
 
On numerous occasions, Dr. Galea and the employee entered the U.S. at the Peace Bridge Port of 
Entry in Buffalo, New York. Other times, Dr. Galea flew from Toronto to various American 
cities. On some occasions, Dr. Galea traveled within the United States to different places to 
provide medical treatments to professional athletes. 
 
When Dr. Galea and the employee traveled separately to the United States, the employee carried 
medical supplies based upon a checklist she prepared based on Dr. Galea’s instructions, which 
included Nutropin, Actovegin, ATP, ginseng, Celebrex, IV tubing, a centrifuge, plasma kits, and 
sterile gloves.  
 
Dr. Galea and the employee understood that if she was asked by U.S. border officers about the 
purpose for her entry into the United States with the medical supplies, she would respond that 
she was attending a medical conference where Dr. Galea would speak and demonstrate the use of 
medical supplies. Dr. Galea and the employee knew, however, that on the majority of the 
occasions they came to the United States, their only purpose for coming to the U.S. was to 
provide medical treatments to Dr. Galea’s patients. Some of the medical supplies Dr. Galea and 
the employee brought into the United States for these treatments, including Nutropin and 
Actovegin, were misbranded drugs within the meaning of U.S. law. 
 
 
The following is a list of treatments Dr. Galea provided to his patients while in the United States:  
 
   -  Anti-inflammatory -IVs, i.e., intravenous treatments involving a mixture containing 
      Actovegin (a substance derived from calf's blood), and Adenosine Triphosphate (ATP), 
      Traumeel, magnesium, calcium, vitamins C, B- 1.00, B-6, and Glutathiome; 
   -  Plasma Rich Platelet ("PRP") treatments, which involved extracting blood from patients, 
      spinning the blood in a centrifuge to separate the plasma from the red blood cells, and re-
      injecting  the plasma into the patients for the purpose of accelerating the healing process. 
   -  Injections containing a mixture of substances including  Actovegin, Traumeel, Vitamin 
      B-12 and (in the case of chronic injuries) Zeel, as treatment for injured muscles; and 
   -  Injections containing a mixture of substances including Nutropin, a human growth 
      hormone (HGH) produced by recombinant DNA technology, Traumeel, Procaine, Zeel, 
      and vitamin B-12 injected into the knee and given for the purpose of treating joint 
      inflammation. 
       
While in the United States, Dr. Galea also from time to time distributed and administered 
substances such as ATP for intramuscular injections. Items used for intramuscular injections 
were labeled in languages other than English. 
 
Prescription items distributed by Dr. Galea, including Nutropin, did not bear the "RX only" 
symbol required by U.S. 1aw and U.S. Food and Drug Administration (FDA) regulations. Under 
U.S. law and FDA regulations, substances intended for use in the treatment of disease are 
“misbranded” if they are not approved by the FDA and labeled in the English language. The 
forms of Actovegin used as ingredients in the anti-inflammatory IVs and in the injections for 
injured muscles were not labeled in English but instead were labeled in German or Russian. 
Nutropin was not approved by the FDA for the uses intended by Dr. Galea. Actovegin was not 
approved by the FDA for any use.  
 
Dr. Galea administered medical treatments in the United States in such places as the homes of 
patients and in hotel rooms. The cost of the treatments, travel, lodging, and other expenses for 
Dr. Galea and the employee were charged to the patients. The amount Dr. Galea charged to the 
patients during the aforementioned time period was approximately $800,000.00. For the 
purposes of the Plea Agreement, Dr. Galea and the U.S. government agreed that the value of the 
substances provided to the patients which contained unapproved and/or misbranded substances 
exceeded $30,000.00 but did not exceed $70,000.00. 
 
On or about August 27, 2009, Dr. Galea and the employee traveled to the United States 
separately. The employee entered the U.S. at the Peace Bridge and Dr. Galea traveled to the U.S. 
from Toronto by air. The purpose of Dr. Galea’s entry into the United States was to provide 
medical treatments to several athletes.  
 
On September 14, 2009, on Dr. Galea’s instructions, the employee attempted to enter the United 
States at the Peace Bridge in Buffalo to meet Dr. Galea in Washington D.C., where Dr. Galea 
was to provide medical treatment to a professional athlete. Dr. Galea was flying directly from 
Toronto. The employee was referred to secondary inspection. During secondary inspection, the 
employee told an Officer from the Department of Homeland Security, Customs and Border 
Protection (CBP), that she was traveling to Washington, D.C. to attend a medical conference 
with her employer, Dr. Galea. The employee further stated to the CBP Officer that she had items 
intended for display at the medical conference. The employee made these statements pursuant to 
an understanding she had with Dr. Galea that she would falsely tell U.S. border personnel that 
she and Dr. Galea would be attending a medical conference in the United States. A duffle bag in 
her vehicle contained medical items including needles, over one hundred syringes, a medical 
centrifuge, numerous bottles, including a bottle of Nutropin and bottles of Actovegin, 20 vials 
and 76 ampoules of drugs not properly branded in contravention of  U.S. Regulations, and a 
diagnostic ultrasound computer.  
 
As a result of the above conduct, the employee was arrested and charged in the United States. 
The employee pleaded guilty in the United States District Court to making a false statement to a 
federal agent, and was convicted of a felony criminal offence. On July 25, 2011, she was 
sentenced to one year probation. She is unable to travel to the United States without permission. 
 
On December 16, 2011, Dr. Galea was sentenced to time served, namely the day of his voluntary 
surrender to U.S. authorities, during which he had not been in detention, and supervised release 
for one year on the terms set out in the Judgment. 
 
 
PENALTY 
 
On December 6, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
 - The Registrar suspend Dr. Galea’s certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) months, 
   effective immediately. 
 - Dr. Galea appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within 60 days of the 
   date of this Order. 
 - Dr. Galea pay to the College costs in the amount of $21,500.00 within 60 days of the date of 
   this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: October 24 & 25, 2016 Motion: February 8, 2017 Penalty: July 4-7, 2017