Galley, Peter William (CPSO#: 33721)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Galley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galley ( CPSO# 33721 )

Business Address:
315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON  K8A 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 735-2597

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2017