Galvin, Patti Ann (CPSO#: 60659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: (519) 837-2020 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 763-9871
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patti Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galvin ( CPSO# 60659 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATTI ANN GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990