Gambarotto, Kathryn Rose (CPSO#: 68913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L7
Phone: (905) 575-0611
Fax: (905) 575-7737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Gambarotto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gambarotto ( CPSO# 68913 )

Business Address:
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L7
Phone Number: (905) 575-0611

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ROSE GAMBAROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1999