Gamble, Patrick Raymond (CPSO#: 77589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
248 Earl Stewart Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 6V8
Phone: (905) 503-4445
Fax: (905) 503-8596
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Gamble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gamble ( CPSO# 77589 )

Business Address:
200 - 248 Earl Stewart Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 6V8
Phone Number: (905) 503-4445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK RAYMOND GAMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007