Ganguli, Subhas Chandra (CPSO#: 72765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37319
Fax: (905) 526-0540
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Subhas C. Ganguli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ganguli ( CPSO# 72765 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBHAS CHANDRA GANGULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGULI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2000