Garber, Gary Erwyn (CPSO#: 50620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8856
Fax: (613) 737-8009
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2380 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C4
Canada
Phone: (613) 317-3318
Fax: (613) 903-4213
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary E. Garber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Garber ( CPSO# 50620 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Infectious Diseases
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY ERWYN GARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986