Garces, Patricio Borromeo (CPSO#: 62837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Phone: (416) 299-9895
Fax: (416) 299-9221
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lake of The Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2201
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

1 Young Street Suite 218
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Canada
Phone: (905) 572-6868
Fax: (905) 572-6860
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P Garces Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Garces ( CPSO# 62837 )

Business Address:
Suite 218
1 Yonge Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 572-6868

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
Suite 304
4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Phone Number: (416) 299-9895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIO BORROMEO GARCES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1993