Garcia Gelvez, Claudia Marcela (CPSO#: 84894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad El Bosque, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Prospect Street Suite 200
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Canada
Phone: 905 235 7284
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garcia Gelvez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Garcia Gelvez ( CPSO# 84894 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 235-7284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA MARCELA GARCIA GELVEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA GELVEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016