Gardiner, Donald Irwin (CPSO#: 68041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103
P O Box 790
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-8482
Fax: (705) 526-8789
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WAYPOINT CENTRE FOR MENTAL HEALTH
500 Church Street
Penetang ON  L0K 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2902
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD IRWIN GARDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDINER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1996