Gardner, Douglas Joseph (CPSO#: 54065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone: (416) 763-4331
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Gardner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gardner ( CPSO# 54065 )

Business Address:
103 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 763-4331

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOSEPH GARDNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1989