Garg, Amit (CPSO#: 70452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Kidney Clinical Research Unit
ELL-200 Wing
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8502
Fax: (519) 685-8028
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Garg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garg ( CPSO# 70452 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Kidney Clinical Research Unit
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000