Gartner, Sean L (CPSO#: 67869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
535 Belmont Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone: (519) 576-1630
Fax: (519) 576-4461
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Gartner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gartner ( CPSO# 67869 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 3E9
Phone Number: (519) 576-1630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN L GARTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARTNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996