Gasser, Joseph (CPSO#: 55726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Slovenian

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Bartley Drive
Toronto ON  M4A 1B8
Phone: (416) 750-8149
Fax: (416) 750-8150
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Gasser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gasser ( CPSO# 55726 )

Business Address:
28 Bartley Drive
Toronto ON  M4A 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 750-8149

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1987