Gaudet, Laura Marie (CPSO#: 77521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-8902
Fax: (613) 728-4745
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Gaudet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gaudet ( CPSO# 77521 )

Business Address:
Harmony Medical Centre
152 Cleopatra Drive
Suite 101
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE GAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUDET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013