Gawel, Marek Jan (CPSO#: 42168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Cambridge, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 806
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 485-7749
Fax: (416) 485-7095
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 406
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-3323
Fax: (416) 281-9774
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Headache Clinic
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4685
Fax: (416) 480-6885
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAREK JAN GAWEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAWEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984