Gawlik, Janusz Donat (CPSO#: 62005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Metcalfe Str.
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone: (613) 569-2300
Fax: (613) 569-7170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janusz D. Gawlik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gawlik ( CPSO# 62005 )

Business Address:
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone Number: (613) 569-2300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANUSZ DONAT GAWLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAWLIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1994