Gazendam, Mary Kathryn (CPSO#: 59998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Amherstview Medical Centre
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone: (613) 634-9898
Fax: (613) 634-3555
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gazendam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gazendam ( CPSO# 59998 )

Business Address:
Amherstview Medical Centre
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 634-9898

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY KATHRYN GAZENDAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZENDAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988