Gebrechristos, Ephrem (CPSO#: 59918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Tigrigna

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Weston Road
Suite 210
Weston ON  M9N 1W4
Phone: (416) 241-2441
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3585 Keel St.
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EPHREM GEBRECHRISTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBRECHRISTOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990