Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Geerts, William Henry (CPSO#: 50627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5953
Fax: (416) 480-5153
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geerts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Geerts ( CPSO# 50627 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5953

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HENRY GEERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEERTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986