Geiger, Glen William (CPSO#: 60022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
PO Box 124
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geiger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Geiger ( CPSO# 60022 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN WILLIAM GEIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEIGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1989