Gelman, Marc Loren (CPSO#: 69528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hosp General Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8200
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hosp Birchmount Div
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmuont Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dubo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gelman ( CPSO# 69528 )
Dr. E. Dubo ( CPSO# 59369 )

Business Address:
Unit 5016
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 322-5433

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Division
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 10 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Marc  Loren  Gelman may practise medicine independently in emergency
                  medicine, only.