Geloso, Corrado Giuseppe (CPSO#: 61004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5038
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Geloso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geloso ( CPSO# 61004 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORRADO GIUSEPPE GELOSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELOSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991