George, William Stanley (CPSO#: 60222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perry Street Medical Centre
Suite 101
12 Perry Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3C2
Phone: (519) 539-1526
Fax: (519) 539-7508
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William George Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. George ( CPSO# 60222 )

Business Address:
Perry Street Medical Centre
12 Perry Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3C2
Phone Number: (519) 539-1526

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM STANLEY GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989