Georgevich, Lila Lepa (CPSO#: 59515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
408 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-3533
Fax: (416) 281-3671
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Stroke Clinic
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building B, Suite 2202
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-9713
Fax: (416) 431-5259
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILA LEPA GEORGEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGEVICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989