Gerin-Lajoie, Caroline Marie-Andree (CPSO#: 69012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Box 918
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 70516
Fax: (613) 737-8331
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

451 Smyth Rd,
Office 3030
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-5800 Ext. 8507
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Hebert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gerin-Lajoie ( CPSO# 69012 )
Dr. G. Hebert ( CPSO# 62218 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE-ANDREE GERIN-LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERIN-LAJOIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000