Gershon, Andrea Sara (CPSO#: 70115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4758
Fax: (416) 480-5153
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gershon ( CPSO# 70115 )
Dr. R. Wu ( CPSO# 70088 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA SARA GERSHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSHON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000