Gervais, Charles William (CPSO#: 52311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
66 The Fairways
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3T8
Phone: (519) 992-7196
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan
USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]

            As from July 7, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Charles William
            Gervais, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gervais to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Gervais shall not interpret or supervise CT scans except to the
                  extent necessary to complete a CT Scan Skills Program approved by the
                  College.