Ghadirian, Gissou Susan (CPSO#: 68344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Ghadirian, Gissou (used until: 30 Apr 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
1436 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M9P 3A9
Phone: (416) 614-9134
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghadirian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghadirian ( CPSO# 68344 )

Business Address:
204 - 1436 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M9P 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 614-9134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GISSOU SUSAN GHADIRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADIRIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996