Ghai, Sandeep (CPSO#: 78121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The New Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7740
Fax: (416) 323-7325
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Marvelle Koffler Breast Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Breast Imaging
12Th Floor, 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
Department Of Breast Imaging
3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandeep Ghai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghai ( CPSO# 78121 )

Business Address:
New Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
12th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sandeep  Ghai  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology
            limited to breast imaging, only.