Ghali, Atef Malak Shehata (CPSO#: 91309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4473 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 3J7
Phone: (613) 424-4103
Fax: (613) 424-2830
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atef Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghali ( CPSO# 91309 )
Dr. M. Mikhail ( CPSO# 99580 )

Business Address:
4473 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 3J7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATEF MALAK SHEHATA GHALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 24 May 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 24 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 May 2016
Summary:

On May 24, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Atef Malak Shehata Ghali committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional. 

Dr. Ghali, who practised family medicine in Egypt until 2006, obtained his Certificate of 
Independent Practice in Ontario 2012. 
 
Dr. Ghali treated Patient A at a family health clinic for depression, anxiety, and other health 
issues.  
 
In May 2014, Patient A made a report of unwanted hugging and kissing by Dr. Ghali to staff 
at the family health clinic, who then initiated the mandatory report to the College. 
 
On two occasions, Dr. Ghali concluded the appointment by kissing Patient A on the cheek 
and hugging her. Patient A was upset by the kisses and hugs and felt that Dr. Ghali's 
conduct was inappropriate in the context of a medical appointment. 
 
While Dr. Ghali intended his conduct to be supportive of Patient A, he now recognizes that 
his conduct was not appropriate conduct for a physician towards his patient, that it breached 
appropriate physician-patient boundaries and was not welcomed in any way by Patient A. 
 
PENALTY AND COSTS 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   -  the Registrar suspend Dr. Ghali's Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month 
      period effective immediately; 
   -  the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Ghali's 
      certificate of registration, to be removed once the College receives proof of 
      completion of the course: 
      -  Dr. Ghali shall successfully complete the next available course in 
         Understanding Boundaries, at his own expense; 
-  Dr. Ghali appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and that 
-  Dr. Ghali pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 
   within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 24, 2016