Ghany, Farouk Abdul (CPSO#: 19089)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017


Former Name: Ghany, Frank (used until: 10 Sep 1996 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F.A. Ghany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website:
Instructions: Patients seen at the New Best Care Medical Centre please contact: Unit 4 720 Burnhamthorpe Road West Mississauga, ON L5C 3G1 Tel: 905 848 8686
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011


Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017