Ghorayeb, Sahar Hanna (CPSO#: 82510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghorayeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghorayeb ( CPSO# 82510 )

Business Address:
Unit 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR HANNA GHORAYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHORAYEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007