Ghoreishi Nejad Esfarjani, Mahsa (CPSO#: 95827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
688A East River Road
New Glasgow NS  B2H 3S1
Phone: (902) 752-3632 Ext. 4739
Fax: (902) 755-5532
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Healthe Care Centre
300 Rossland Rd East
Ajax ON  L1Z0M1
Canada
Phone: 902-239-7663
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: One Health Clinic 300 Rossland Road Ajax, ON L1Z 0M1
Date Received: 30 May 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHSA GHOREISHI NEJAD ESFARJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOREISHI NEJAD ESFARJANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013