Ghotbi, Shahrzad (CPSO#: 95140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Shiraz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-250 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L8B 0E7
Phone: (905) 690-6748
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahrzad Ghotbi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghotbi ( CPSO# 95140 )

Business Address:
1 - 250 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L8B 0E7
Phone Number: (905) 690-6748

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRZAD GHOTBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOTBI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2013