Ghuman, Harleen Kaur (CPSO#: 93525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department Of Psychiatry
850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3968
Fax: (519) 749-4456
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rahil ( CPSO# 84812 )
Dr. H. Ghuman ( CPSO# 93525 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Conestoga College Health Services
299 Doon Valley Drive
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M4
Phone Number: (519) 748-5220

Business Address:
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 780-0375

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARLEEN KAUR GHUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHUMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012