Gibson, Katherine Jean (CPSO#: 98493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Canadian Field Hospital
CFB Petawawa
PO Box 9999
Station Main
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE JEAN GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014