Giffin, James Robert (CPSO#: 67996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy
Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Center
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3454
Fax: (519) 850-2496
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giffin ( CPSO# 67996 )
Dr. D. Bauld Giffin ( CPSO# 68765 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Center - University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3454

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital - London Health Sciences Centre
391 South Street
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
1490 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 2M3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001